Meisner v. Zymogenetics, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Meisner
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Ellison McCoy, Tracey Caldarazzo, John Doe 1-10, Zymogenetics, LLC, Jane Doe 1-10, Stephanie Lewis, Zymogenetics, Inc and Jeff Fortino
Case Number: 3:2019cv01555
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Tracey Caldarazzo, Stephanie Lewis(individually), Ellison McCoy(in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Zymogenetics, Inc, Zymogenetics, LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McCoy, Ellison)
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Tracey Caldarazzo, Jeff Fortino, Stephanie Lewis(individually), Ellison McCoy(in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Zymogenetics, Inc, Zymogenetics, LLC. (McCoy, Ellison)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY by Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Tracey Caldarazzo, Jane Doe 1-10, John Doe 1-10, Jeff Fortino, Stephanie Lewis(individually), Stephanie Lewis(in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, LLP), Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(individually), Zymogenetics, Inc, Zymogenetics, LLC to #11 Order,, Set Deadlines, Memorandum on the Common Defense Exception to Fraudulent Joinder. (McCoy, Ellison)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY by Rhonda Meisner to #11 Order - Memorandum on the Common Defense Exception to a Fraudulent Joinder Analysis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (bgoo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Response filed by Rhonda Meisner. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (bgoo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Sanctions Response filed by Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Tracey Caldarazzo, Jane Doe 1-10, John Doe 1-10, Jeff Fortino, Stephanie Lewis(individually), Stephanie Lewis(in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, LLP), Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(individually), Zymogenetics, Inc, Zymogenetics, LLC. (McCoy, Ellison)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rhonda Meisner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (bgoo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Rhonda Meisner. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Sanctions Response filed by Rhonda Meisner. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (lbak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Rhonda Meisner, PO Box 689, Blythewood, SC 29016 (bgoo)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the parties to brief the issue of whether the so-called "common defense" exception to the doctrine of fraudulent joinder applies and whether this case should be remanded to state court because not all defendants are diverse. Memoranda addressing this issue must be filed on or before July 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/27/2019. (bgoo)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #9 Roseboro Order, #8 Order to Notify of Address Change and blank 26.01 form placed in U.S. Mail to Rhonda Meisner, PO Box 689, Blythewood, SC 29016 from Columbia Division (bgoo)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/10/2019. (bgoo)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes and to submit completed and signed answers to the court's interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.) within twenty-one (21)days. (Interrogatory answers due by 7/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/10/2019. (bgoo)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Sanctions by Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Tracey Caldarazzo, Jeff Fortino, Stephanie Lewis(individually), Stephanie Lewis(in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, LLP), Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(individually), Zymogenetics, Inc, Zymogenetics, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(McCoy, Ellison)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Tracey Caldarazzo, Jeff Fortino, Stephanie Lewis(individually), Stephanie Lewis(in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, LLP), Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy(individually), Zymogenetics, Inc, Zymogenetics, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Meisner's Informal Brief to the 4th Circuit, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Meisner's Reply Brief to the 4th Circuit, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Meisner's Petition for Rehearing to 4th Circuit, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - 9-20-17 4th Circuit Opinion, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - Meisner's Petition for Writ of Certiorari, #7 Exhibit Ex. F - Meisner's Petition for Rehearing)No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(McCoy, Ellison)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Tracey Caldarazzo, Jeff Fortino, Stephanie Lewis (individually), Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, LLP), Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy (in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Ellison McCoy (individually), Zymogenetics, Inc, Zymogenetics, LLC. (bgoo)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-01948, filed by Jeff Fortino, Ellison McCoy (in his capacity as office litigation manager of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Zymogenetics, LLC, Stephanie Lewis (individually), Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, P.C.), Zymogenetics, Inc, Stephanie Lewis (in her capacity as managing principal of Jackson Lewis, LLP), Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc, Ellison McCoy (individually), Tracey Caldarazzo. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8471543) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Limited Liability Company Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Petition for Rehearing to the Supreme Court in Meisner II) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meisner v. Zymogenetics, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb, Inc
Represented By: Ellison Ford McCoy
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellison McCoy
Represented By: Ellison Ford McCoy
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Caldarazzo
Represented By: Ellison Ford McCoy
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zymogenetics, LLC
Represented By: Ellison Ford McCoy
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lewis
Represented By: Ellison Ford McCoy
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zymogenetics, Inc
Represented By: Ellison Ford McCoy
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Fortino
Represented By: Ellison Ford McCoy
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Meisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?