Bates v. Michael Baker International
Plaintiff: Marjean Yvette Bates
Defendant: Michael Baker International
Case Number: 3:2019cv01589
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #24 Order Service - Non-Inmate w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Marjean Yvette Bates, 1032 Congaree Church Road, Gadsden, SC 29502. (prou, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Michael Baker International. Service due by 9/30/2019. (prou, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/1/2019. (prou, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #18 Second Proper Form Order w/NEF and USM-285 Form, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Marjean Yvette Bates, 1032 Congaree Church Road, Gadsden, SC 29502. (prou, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/20/2019. (prou, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #11 Proper Form Order w/NEF, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, original #1 Complaint, blank version of Sections III, E, and V of the Complaint, and one USM-285 Form, placed in U.S. Mail to Marjean Yvette Bates, 1032 Congaree Church Road, Gadsden, SC 29502. (prou, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #11 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/5/2019.(prou, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 6/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/5/2019. (prou, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Marjean Yvette Bates. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Marjean Yvette Bates.(prou, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Baker International, filed by Marjean Yvette Bates. Service due by 9/3/2019.(prou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Supplemental Pleading in Response to Proper Form Order, #2 Supporting Documents) (prou, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Michael Baker International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Baker International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjean Yvette Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?