Bowers v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Christopher H Bowers
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01708
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER and SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/13/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/16/2020, Discovery due by 4/29/2020, Motions due by 5/20/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/29/19. (mflo, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 7/29/2019. Court to file scheduling order. Court Reporter not present. (mflo, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, July 29, 2019 at 10:45 a.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 7/10/19. (mflo, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher H Bowers.(Sheheen, Vincent)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, July 16, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 6/21/19. (mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than July 1, 2019. (mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Kershaw County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court's Acknowledgement of Removal)(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(mflo, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kershaw County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-28-424. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8504507), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Documents Letter from SCDOI, #3 State Court Documents Verdict for Underlying Suit, #4 Public Index for Underlying Suit)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Kathleen McTighe Mellen
Represented By: Charles R Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher H Bowers
Represented By: Gregory Brian Collins
Represented By: Vincent A Sheheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?