United States of America v. 25,211.31 dollars in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 25,211.31 dollars in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv01732
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #7 Service by Publication. (Sherard, Carrie) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 8/7/2019 (cbru, ). (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/7/2019) (cbru, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie) Modified to edit text on 8/5/2019 (cbru, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned Executed as to 25,211.31 dollars in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Sherard, Carrie) Modified to edit text on 6/21/2019 (cbru, ).
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (cbru, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (cbru, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 25,211.31 dollars in United States Currency (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Agent Julie Yelk)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 25,211.31 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 25,211.31 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?