Riley v. Civil Action No. 2014-CP-32-00665 et al
Plaintiff: Annette I. Riley
Defendant: Civil Action No. 2014-CP-32-00665, Irmo Magistrate Court, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC., James O. Spence, Rebecca L. Adams, Civil Action No. 2014-CP-32-04060, Warren Herndon, Jr., Allied Investment Group of SC, LLC., Timothy Driggers and Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01796
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 16 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Annette I. Riley, 536 Sail Point Way, Columbia, SC 29212 (bgoo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge J. Michelle Childs. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia, South Carolina 29201. (bgoo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #1 Complaint be summarily dismissed with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/23/2019. (bgoo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION (Amended) for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Annette I. Riley. (Response to Motion due by 7/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendation by Annette I. Riley. Reply to Objections due by 7/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (bgoo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order, #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Annette I. Riley 536 Sail Point Way Columbia, SC 29212 (bgoo)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER temporarily granting Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff is advised that her objections to the Report and Recommendation are due on Wednesday, July 17, 2019. The court stays eviction until it enters final order. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/3/2019. (asni, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plaintiff's #5 motion for a temporary restraining order be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/3/2019. (bgoo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Annette I. Riley. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Annette I. Riley. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX300082352.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Annette I. Riley) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Civil Action No. 2014-CP-32-00665 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Action No. 2014-CP-32-00665
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irmo Magistrate Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Action No. 2014-CP-32-04060
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Herndon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Investment Group of SC, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Driggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette I. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?