Gilpin v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Boyd Gilpin
Defendant: John Doe and Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01853
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Geico Indemnity Company. (Robinson, Jonathan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Doe.(King, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by John Doe.(King, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by John Doe. (King, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/23/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/1/2019. (asni, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/5/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/5/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/16/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/15/2019, Discovery due by 12/16/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 12/30/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 3/31/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/1/2019. (asni, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Geico Indemnity Company.(asni, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Geico Indemnity Company. (asni, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sumter County, case number 2019-CP-43-01093. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8532167), filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilpin v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Robert Thomas King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Shanon Nicole Peake
Represented By: Jonathan M Robinson
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyd Gilpin
Represented By: Stephen B Samuels
Represented By: Phillip Jason Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?