Garcia v. Great Southern Homes
Plaintiff: Jerome S. Garcia
Defendant: Great Southern Homes
Case Number: 3:2019cv01897
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jerome S. Garcia, 1412 Pinson St., Columbia, SC 29203. (lbak)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER denying #22 Motion for Extension of Time. The scheduling order in this case, which provides a November 14, 2019 deadline for amending pleadings, was not issued until Plaintiff's release from jail. Additionally, Plaintiff is reminded of his responsibility to keep the Clerk of Court apprised of his address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/22/19. (vhor)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time by Jerome S. Garcia. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #20 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jerome S. Garcia, 1412 Pinson St., Columbia, SC 29203. (lbak)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/14/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 3/30/2020, ADR Statement due by 4/27/2020, Mediation Due by 5/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/19/2019. (lbak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Michael Wills on behalf of Great Southern Homes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wills, Grant)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Great Southern Homes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Carrouth, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Great Southern Homes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Carrouth, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Great Southern Homes. Service due by 10/16/2019. (lbak)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jerome S. Garcia, 1412 Pinson St., Columbia, SC 29203. (lbak)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/17/2019. (lbak)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #9 Proper Form Order and one FORM USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jerome S. Garcia, 1412 Pinson St., Columbia, SC 29203. (lbak)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 7/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/8/2019. (lbak)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Jerome S. Garcia to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim - Update, #2 Text Messages) (lbak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jerome S. Garcia. (lbak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jerome S. Garcia. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Great Southern Homes, filed by Jerome S. Garcia. (lbak) Supplement added on 7/8/2019 at #7 . (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Great Southern Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Southern Homes
Represented By: Michael Dennis Carrouth
Represented By: Grant Michael Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome S. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?