Trustgard Insurance Company v. Eazy Towing Express, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustgard Insurance Company
Defendant: Erissen Davis, Anthony Hunter and Eazy Towing Express, LLC
Petitioner: Eric T. Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv01910
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #15 Order, blank 26.01 form, and District Court's pro se litigant guide placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Anthony Hunter, 4930 Dennis Road, Rembert, SC 29128 and Erissen Davis, 2150 Eureka Way, Sumter, SC. Copy of #15 Order placed in the U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerk's Office to Eazy Towing Express, LLC via Eric T. Davis, 35 Grier Street, Sumter, SC 29153. (bgoo)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing Defendants Anthony Hunter and Erissen Davis to submit fully completed and signed answers to the court's interrogatories within twenty-one (21) days, advising the defendants to keep the Clerk of Court advised in writing of any address change, and advising Defendant Eazy Towing Express, LLC that it cannot proceed without counsel in this action. (Interrogatory answers due by 9/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Erissen Davis and Eazy Towing Express, LLC answers to the Complaint due by 9/20/2019. Easy Towing Express, LLC to obtain counsel by 9/20/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/27/2019. (bgoo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 11 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge(Non-Consent) placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Anthony Hunter, 4930 Dennis Road, Rembert, SC 29128; Eric T. Davis, 35 Grier Street, Sumter, SC 29153; Erissen Davis, 2150 Eureka Way, Sumter, SC 29153 (cbru, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett pursuant to LR 73.02. Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(cbru, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Erissen Davis. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(cbru, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint as to Eazy Towing Express, LLC by Eric T. Davis. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(cbru, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Anthony Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cbru, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustgard Insurance Company. Eazy Towing Express, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Anthony Hunter served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Erissen Davis served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service (Eazy Towing Express, LLC), #2 Proof of Service (Anthony Hunter), #3 Proof of Service (Erissen Davis))(Flynn, William) Modified to edit text on 8/1/2019 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Erissen Davis. (cbru, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anthony Hunter. (cbru, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eazy Towing Express, LLC. (cbru, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trustgard Insurance Company.(cbru, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erissen Davis, Eazy Towing Express, LLC, Anthony Hunter (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8540442) filed by Trustgard Insurance Company. Service due by 10/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Hunter's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Davis's Complaint)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustgard Insurance Company v. Eazy Towing Express, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erissen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eazy Towing Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustgard Insurance Company
Represented By: William James Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?