B. v. Hutchison et al
Plaintiff: R. B.
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company and James Hutchison
Case Number: 3:2019cv01941
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of any party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/13/2019. (cbru, ) (Main Document 19 replaced to correct scrivener's error in header on 8/13/2019) (cbru, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/15/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Loss Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 23, 2019 Letter to Marion Moses)(Harris, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Crossclaim #15 by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(Harris, David) Modified to edit text on 8/2/2019 (cbru, ).
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Hutchison.(Hardee, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company by James Hutchison.(Hardee, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by R. B. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tort Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State DJ Complaint)No proposed order.(Kassel, John) Modified to correct motion relief and to edit text on 7/25/2019 (cbru, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by R. B..(Kassel, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 8, 2019. (cbru, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/10/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/10/2019, Discovery due by 2/4/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 2/18/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2020, ADR Statement due by 3/17/2020, Mediation Due by 4/14/2020. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/17/2019. (cbru, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(Harris, David) Modified to edit text on 7/17/2019 (cbru, ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company re #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2019-07-10 Letter to James Hutchison)(Harris, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Grant Harris, II on behalf of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Harris, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(cbru, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-03520 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8547841) filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Richland County Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. v. Hutchison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David Grant Harris, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hutchison
Represented By: Mark Weston Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. B.
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: Marion M Moses
Represented By: John Daniel Kassel
Represented By: Jamie Rae Rutkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?