United States of America v. 34545.08 dollars in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 34545.08 dollars in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv02035
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM Verified Claim by 34545.08 dollars in United States Currency. (Parham, Rose)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Mary Parham on behalf of 34545.08 dollars in United States Currency (Parham, Rose)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned as to in rem property/cash. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM ISSUED (mflo, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (mflo, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 34545.08 dollars in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Julie Yelk)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 34545.08 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 34545.08 dollars in United States Currency
Represented By: Rose Mary Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?