United States of America v. 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency
Claimant: Lamar Graves
Case Number: 3:2019cv02091
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency.(Parham, Rose)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM Verified claim by 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency. (Parham, Rose)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Mary Parham on behalf of 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency (Parham, Rose)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned as to in rem property/cash. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem with Return)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (mflo, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (mflo, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency (Filing fee waived), filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Julie Yelk)(mflo, ) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct text(mflo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45,413.65 dollars in United States Currency
Represented By: Rose Mary Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lamar Graves
Represented By: Rose Mary Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?