Black et al v. Mantei & Associates, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Thompson, Rebecca Martin, Donald Black, Larry Martin, Marcia Black and James Thompson
Defendant: Mantei & Associates, Ltd., J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C, Cindy Chiellini, Ricky Alan Mantei and Centaurus Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02097
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees Response filed by Donald Black, Marcia Black, Larry Martin, Rebecca Martin, Barbara Thompson, James Thompson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Willoughby, Mitchell)
September 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Hearing re #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by Centaurus Financial, Inc., Cindy Chiellini, J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C, Ricky Alan Mantei, Mantei & Associates, Ltd.. Response to Motion due by 10/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smith, Joel)
September 17, 2019 Filing 30 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 28. Reason: Document not signed by the attorney who electronically filed it. Corrected Filing Document Number #29 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 9/16/2019. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 9/17/2019 (cbru, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees Response filed by Donald Black, Marcia Black, Larry Martin, Rebecca Martin, Barbara Thompson, James Thompson. (Willoughby, Mitchell) Modified to correct filing date on 9/17/2019 (cbru, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees Response filed by Centaurus Financial, Inc., Cindy Chiellini, J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C, Ricky Alan Mantei, Mantei & Associates, Ltd..Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/16/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Luis v. RBC Capital Mkts., #3 Exhibit C - Harel Pia Mut. Fund v. Toyota Motor Co.)(Smith, Joel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Donald Black, Marcia Black, Larry Martin, Rebecca Martin, Barbara Thompson, James Thompson. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Willoughby, Mitchell) Modified to correct motion relief and to add additional motion relief on 8/27/2019 (cbru, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Donald Black, Marcia Black, Larry Martin, Rebecca Martin, Barbara Thompson, James Thompson.(Willoughby, Mitchell)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Stay pending briefing, argument, and a determination on Plaintiffs' forthcoming motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/14/2019.(cbru, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Cindy Chiellini, Ricky Alan Mantei, Mantei & Associates, Ltd..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/20/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Montgomery, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Donald Black, Marcia Black, Larry Martin, Rebecca Martin, Barbara Thompson, James Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit B- Email)(Willoughby, Mitchell)
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Centaurus Financial, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Smith, Joel)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 23, 2019. (cbru, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay by Donald Black, Marcia Black, Larry Martin, Rebecca Martin, Barbara Thompson, James Thompson. Response to Motion due by 8/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Law, #2 Exhibit B - Case Law, #3 Exhibit C - Case Law, #4 Exhibit D - Case Law)No proposed order.(Willoughby, Mitchell) Modified to edit text on 8/9/2019 (cbru, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Protective Order Response filed by Centaurus Financial, Inc., Cindy Chiellini, J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C, Ricky Alan Mantei, Mantei & Associates, Ltd..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/15/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Smith, Joel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 13. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #14 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. (cbru, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Stay by Centaurus Financial, Inc., Cindy Chiellini, J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C, Ricky Alan Mantei, Mantei & Associates, Ltd. (Response to Motion due by 8/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. )(Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Memo In Support - Declaration of Michael Leahy, #3 Exhibit B to Memo In Support - Case Law, #4 Exhibit C to Memo In Support - Case Law)No proposed order.(Smith, Joel) Modified to edit text on 8/2/2019 (cbru, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Complaint by Centaurus Financial, Inc., Cindy Chiellini, J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C, Ricky Alan Mantei, Mantei & Associates, Ltd.. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Manning, Cory) Modified to edit text on 8/2/2019 (cbru, ). (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/2/2019) (cbru, ).
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9. Reason: An incorrect ECF login was used. Corrected Filing Document Number #10 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Lexington County. (Attachments: #1 Signed Acknowledgement of Removal)(Malloy, Kevin) Modified to edit text on 8/1/2019 (cbru, ).
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C.(Manning, Cory)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cindy Chiellini, Ricky Alan Mantei, Mantei & Associates, Ltd..(Montgomery, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants Mantei & Associates, Ltd.; Ricky Alan Mantei; Cindy Chiellini; and J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 12, 2019. (cbru, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Centaurus Financial, Inc.(cbru, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 *Originally filed in state court* MOTION for Protective Order by Donald Black, Marcia Black, Larry Martin, Rebecca Martin, Barbara Thompson, James Thompson. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(cbru, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-32-02636 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8580594) filed by Mantei & Associates, Ltd., Ricky Alan Mantei, J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C, Centaurus Financial, Inc., Cindy Chiellini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of M. Leahy, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Notice of Removal)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black et al v. Mantei & Associates, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Thompson
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Represented By: Elizabeth Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Martin
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Represented By: Elizabeth Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Black
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Represented By: Elizabeth Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Martin
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Represented By: Elizabeth Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Black
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Represented By: Elizabeth Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thompson
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Represented By: Elizabeth Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantei & Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Hart Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Turner & Company, L.L.C
Represented By: Cory E Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Chiellini
Represented By: Michael Hart Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Alan Mantei
Represented By: Michael Hart Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centaurus Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Haywood Smith
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?