Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc v. Surveying and Mapping LLC
Plaintiff: Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc
Defendant: Surveying and Mapping LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02147
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/2/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Coskrey, Blaney)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaney A Coskrey, III on behalf of Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc (Coskrey, Blaney)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER Granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc until 9/25/19 to respond to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Surveying and Mapping LLC, ( Response to Motion due by 9/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ). Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 9/5/19. (mflo, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Copeland, Melissa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Surveying and Mapping LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Cox, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc.(Schmidt, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Surveying and Mapping LLC.(mflo, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-3599. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8589003), filed by Surveying and Mapping LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc v. Surveying and Mapping LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surveying and Mapping LLC
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: James Edward Cox, Jr
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Civil Engerineering Consulting Services Inc
Represented By: Melissa J Copeland
Represented By: John E Schmidt, III
Represented By: Blaney A Coskrey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?