Hutto v. USF Holland, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Taylor C. Hutto, Taylor Hutto and Wesley G. Hutto
Defendant: Jack Umstead, USF Holland, LLC and YRC Worldwide Holding Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv02209
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/7/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/15/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/13/2020, Discovery due by 4/15/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/27/2020, Motions due by 4/28/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/13/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/17/2020, Mediation Due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/11/2019. (cbru, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan and Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by USF Holland, LLC, Jack Umstead, YRC Worldwide Holding Company.(Yarborough, William) Modified to edit text on 9/11/2019 (cbru, ).
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by USF Holland, LLC, Jack Umstead, YRC Worldwide Holding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Yarborough, William) Modified to edit text on 9/11/2019 (cbru, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thad Lee Myers on behalf of Wesley G. Hutto (Myers, Thad) Modified to remove filers not listed on document on 8/30/2019 (cbru, ). (Main Document 15 replaced on 8/30/2019) (cbru, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wesley G. Hutto.(Falgione, Adrian) (Main Document 14 replaced on 8/20/2019) (cbru, ).
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, by USF Holland, LLC, Jack Umstead, YRC Worldwide Holding Company.(Yarborough, William)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against USF Holland, LLC, YRC Worldwide Holding Company, Jack Umstead filed by Wesley G. Hutto. Service due by 11/14/2019 (Falgione, Adrian) Modified to add filer listed on document, to remove filers not listed on document, and to edit text on 8/16/2019 (cbru, ).
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint no later than close of business on August 16, 2019. (Amended Complaint due by 8/16/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/15/2019. (cbru, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by Taylor C. Hutto. Response to Motion due by 8/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Falgione, Adrian) Modified to edit text on 8/15/2019 (cbru, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Having reviewed the complaint in this matter, it is unclear to the court if "Taylor C. Hutto" and "Taylor Hutto" are separate plaintiffs or are, in fact, one in the same person. While they are listed separately in the caption, only "Taylor C. Hutto" is referenced in the body of the complaint. Further confusing the matter, the terms "plaintiff" and "plaintiffs" are used interchangeably throughout the body of the complaint. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is therefore directed to file, no later than August 16, 2019, either a reply to this order confirming that "Taylor C. Hutto" and "Taylor Hutto" are separate plaintiffs or, a motion to amend the caption to list either "Taylor C. Hutto" or "Taylor Hutto" as a single plaintiff suing in the appropriate capacities. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply/Motion due by 8/16/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/8/2019. (cbru, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/7/2019. (cbru, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/7/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/5/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/5/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/5/2019, Discovery due by 2/3/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/18/2020, Motions due by 2/18/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/4/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/8/2020, Mediation Due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/7/2019.(cbru, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by USF Holland, LLC, Jack Umstead, YRC Worldwide Holding Company.(cbru, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by USF Holland, LLC, Jack Umstead, YRC Worldwide Holding Company.(cbru, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-32-02907 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8600932) filed by USF Holland, LLC, YRC Worldwide Holding Company, Jack Umstead. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutto v. USF Holland, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor C. Hutto
Represented By: Adrian L Falgione
Represented By: Charles Dayton Riddle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Hutto
Represented By: Adrian L Falgione
Represented By: Charles Dayton Riddle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley G. Hutto
Represented By: Adrian L Falgione
Represented By: Charles Dayton Riddle, III
Represented By: Thad Lee Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Umstead
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: William H Yarborough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Holland, LLC
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: William H Yarborough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Holding Company
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: William H Yarborough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?