Rider v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Rider
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Michigan First Credit Union and University of Detroit Mercy
Case Number: 3:2019cv02250
Filed: August 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Rider. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Kozloski, Aaron)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michigan First Credit Union. (jpet, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to University of Detroit Mercy. (jpet, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (jpet, )
August 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Danielle Rider.(jpet, )
August 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Michigan First Credit Union, University of Detroit Mercy ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8606922.), filed by Danielle Rider. Service due by 11/12/2019(jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rider v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan First Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Detroit Mercy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Rider
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?