CSX Transportation Inc v. South Carolina Department of Revenue et al
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation Inc
Defendant: W Hartley Powell and South Carolina Department of Revenue
Case Number: 3:2019cv02446
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:11503
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Martin Wooten on behalf of W Hartley Powell, South Carolina Department of Revenue (Wooten, Nicole)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 9/17/2019. (mdea )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay pending final resolution of C/A 3:14-3821-MBS. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 9/17/2019.(mdea )
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by CSX Transportation Inc. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Acceptance of Service)(Geer, Bryson)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay and Stipulation for Entry of Preliminary Injunction by CSX Transportation Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Geer, Bryson) Modified on 9/10/2019 to correct attachment descriptions (mdea, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to South Carolina Department of Revenue. (asni, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to W Hartley Powell. (asni, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CSX Transportation Inc.(asni, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W Hartley Powell, South Carolina Department of Revenue ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8642233.), filed by CSX Transportation Inc. Service due by 11/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Section 306 of Railroad Revitalization and Regulatory Reform Act of 1976)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation Inc v. South Carolina Department of Revenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation Inc
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: John Christopher Von Lehe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Hartley Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?