Jordan v. Jordan et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Diana Jordan, Diana Biernaski Jordan and SDJ
Defendant: Franklin ODell Jordan and Evelyn Nates Jordan
Case Number: 3:2019cv02561
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Judgment, #13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Diana Jordan 104 Woodglen Lane Chapin, SC 29036 (mflo, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the plaintiff, Diana Biernaski Jordan take nothing from defendants, and this case is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. (mflo, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Diana Biernaski Jordan; adopting #8 Report and Recommendation and this case is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance of service and process. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/7/19.(mflo, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #7 Order, #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and 9 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Diana Biernaski Jordan, 104 Woodglen Lane, Chapin, SC 29036. (lbak)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr.. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia, South Carolina 29201. (lbak)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge deny Plaintiff's #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) and dismiss the #1 complaint without prejudice to file in an appropriate court and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/13/2019. (lbak)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/13/2019. (lbak)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by SDJ and Diana Biernaski Jordan. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak) (Main Document 3 and Attachment 1 replaced on 9/12/2019 with redacted documents. Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit text.) (lbak)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evelyn Nates Jordan, Franklin ODell Jordan, filed by SDJ and Diana Diernaski Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 1 and Attachment 2 replaced on 9/12/2019 with redacted documents. Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit text.) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin ODell Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Nates Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Diana Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Biernaski Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SDJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?