Dixon v. Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lenwood R. Dixon
Defendant: Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02619
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Lenwood R. Dixon.(Babb, Julius)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/21/2019. (bgoo)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Glass, Benjamin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc..(Glass, Benjamin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc..(Glass, Benjamin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc..(Glass, Benjamin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lenwood R. Dixon.(Babb, Julius)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 10/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/16/2019, Discovery due by 4/13/2020, Motions due by 4/28/2020, Mediation Due by 6/29/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/17/2019. (bgoo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc. (bgoo) Modified on 9/17/2019 to correct filing date. (bgoo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc. (bgoo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sumter County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-43-01672, filed by Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8671614) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Resource Recovery-Sumter, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Elsey McMahon
Represented By: Benjamin P Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenwood R. Dixon
Represented By: Julius Wistar Babb, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?