Adams et al v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Andre Adams and Tawanda Adams
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc. and Stanley Allen Anderson
Case Number: 3:2019cv02865
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Andre Adams, Tawanda Adams.(Bernstein, Lowell)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/9/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/7/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/7/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/7/2020, Discovery due by 7/6/2020, Motion in Limine due by 10/19/2020, Motions due by 7/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/5/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/9/2020, Mediation Due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/13/2019. (cbru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: On October 25, 2019, the Clerk reminded Plaintiffs that "Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal". The Clerk requested that Plaintiffs "file these answers to interrogatories no later than November 8, 2019". Nevertheless, the deadline has passed and Plaintiffs have failed to do so. Therefore, not later than the close of business on November 14, 2019, the Court directs Plaintiffs to file said answers. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Answer to LR26.01 Interrogatories due by 11/14/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/13/2019. (cbru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Stanley Allen Anderson, Knight Transportation, Inc. (Yarborough, William) Modified to edit text on 11/13/2019 (cbru, ).
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Stanley Allen Anderson, Knight Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Yarborough, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than November 8, 2019. (cbru, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 Signed Acknowledgement of Removal)(Yarborough, William) Modified to edit text on 10/22/2019 (cbru, ).
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/10/2019. (cbru, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 11/13/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/8/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/7/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/7/2020, Discovery due by 4/7/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/20/2020, Motions due by 4/22/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/10/2020, Mediation Due by 6/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/10/2019. (cbru, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Stanley Allen Anderson, Knight Transportation, Inc.(cbru, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stanley Allen Anderson, Knight Transportation, Inc.(cbru, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/10/2019) (cbru, ).
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-05008 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8715897) filed by Knight Transportation, Inc., Stanley Allen Anderson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: William H Yarborough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Allen Anderson
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: William H Yarborough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Adams
Represented By: Lowell E Bernstein
Represented By: Beth Elayne Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanda Adams
Represented By: Lowell E Bernstein
Represented By: Beth Elayne Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?