In Re: Infinity Business Group Inc
Appellant: Robert F Anderson
Appellee: Keith E Meyers and Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv03096
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. First attachment description: Appellant's Statement of Issues and Designation of Matter . (Willoughby, Mitchell)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/3/19 for Trustee's to file and serve Statement of Issues and Designation of Matter on Appeal and MK Defendant's have until 1/7/2020 to file and serve designation of additional items to be included in the record; finding as moot #3 Motion for Extension of Time; Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/8/19.(mflo, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time by Robert F Anderson. Response to Motion due by 11/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Willoughby, Mitchell)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Robert F Anderson. Response to Motion due by 11/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Willoughby, Mitchell)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 10-6335-jw., filed by Robert F Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet)(mflo, ) See #7 for additional attachment

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Infinity Business Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert F Anderson
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Represented By: Elizabeth Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Keith E Meyers
Represented By: Robert C Byrd
Represented By: Olga Greenberg
Represented By: S Lawrence Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Represented By: Robert C Byrd
Represented By: Olga Greenberg
Represented By: S Lawrence Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?