Pearson v. Continental Tire Sumter LLC
Plaintiff: Lafaye Pearson
Defendant: Continental Tire Sumter LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03535
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Continental Tire Sumter LLC answer due 3/12/2020. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/24/2020.(asni, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Continental Tire Sumter LLC.(McPherson, Thomas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Continental Tire Sumter LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McPherson, Thomas)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lafaye Pearson. Continental Tire Sumter LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Returned Executed)(Martens, Casey)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Continental Tire Sumter LLC. (bshr, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lafaye Pearson.(bshr, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Continental Tire Sumter LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8836970.), filed by Lafaye Pearson. Service due by 3/17/2020(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Continental Tire Sumter LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafaye Pearson
Represented By: Casey Merrell Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Tire Sumter LLC
Represented By: Thomas Richmond McPherson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?