Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc v. Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc
Plaintiff: Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc
Defendant: Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv03541
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, March 2, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 2/13/20. (mflo, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc.(Nettles, Louis)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc by Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc.(Nettles, Louis)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc. Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Becker, James)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc. (mflo, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc.(mflo, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8840020.), filed by Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc. Service due by 3/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Incorporation Documents, #2 Exhibit 2. Church Constitution, #3 Exhibit 3. Ministerial Statement, #4 Exhibit 4. Feb. 2019 Resolutions, #5 Exhibit 5. Jan 2019 Memorandum, #6 Exhibit 6. Tallahassee Deed, #7 Exhibit 7. Letter to Gavin, #8 Exhibit 8. Special Quitclaim & Corrective Deed)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc v. Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ Inc
Represented By: James Y Becker
Represented By: Costa Michael Pleicones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Church of Our Lord Jesus Christ-Tallahassee Inc
Represented By: Louis David Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?