Harrell v. BMW of North America LLC
Plaintiff: Maurice Harrell
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00218
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BMW of North America LLC.(Orville, Matthew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BMW of North America LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Orville, Matthew) (Attachment: #1 Memo in Support) Modified on 3/11/2020 to add attachment as provided by filing user (lgib, ).
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maurice Harrell. BMW of North America LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Serbin, Lawrence)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BMW of North America LLC. Service due by 4/22/2020. (hcic, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Maurice Harrell.(hcic, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW of North America LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8896090), filed by Maurice Harrell. (hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Harrell
Represented By: Lawrence B Serbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?