Jacobs v. South Carolina Department of Mental Health
Plaintiff: Glenn D. Jacobs
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Mental Health
Case Number: 3:2020cv00543
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the Defendant's 44 motion to dismiss be denied. It is further Ordered that Jacob's 47 motion for an extension of time is denied as moot. (Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/16/2020. (mmcd)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the defendants' partial 26 motion to dismiss be granted. ORDERED that Jacob's 38 motion to amend his Amended Complaint is granted. Jacobs shall file a Second Amend ed Complaint within twenty-one days to correct the deficiencies identified herein, if he so elects. (Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45., Second Amended Complaint due by 9/15/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/25/2020. (mmcd)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting plaintiff's 20 motion for reconsideration and terminating defendant's 4 motion to dismiss from the docket with leave to refile, if appropriate, after the plaintiff amends his pleading. Further, th e court withdraws the 19 Report and Recommendation based on the plaintiff's failure to prosecute. In addition, the court finds that this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and the Plaintiff be allowed to amend his compla int within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order to correct the purported deficiencies identified by the defendant in its motion to dismiss. (Amended Complaint due by 5/20/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/6/2020. (mmcd)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to advise the court as to whether he wishes to continue with this case within seven (7) days from the date of this order. If Plaintiff intends to seek leave for an extension in which to file a re sponse in opposition to the pending 4 motion to dismiss, he must establish the requisite standards for such an untimely filing in accordance with the applicable Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules of this Court. (Status Report due by 3/9/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/2/20. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. South Carolina Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn D. Jacobs
Represented By: Reagan Singletary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?