Music Academy Success, LLC v. Martin
Plaintiff: Music Academy Success, LLC
Defendant: David Charles Martin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00748
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Charles Martin, filed by Music Academy Success, LLC. Service due by 7/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - M.A.S.S. Terms and Conditions of Use, #2 Exhibit B - Legal Disclaimers M.A.S.S. Terms and Conditions of Use, #3 Exhibit C - Conference Attendee and or Conference Materials Purchaser Non-Disclosures Disclaimer and Legal Notice, #4 Exhibit D - 7 Explosive Secrets to Growing Your Music School By David Martin) (McDaniel, Kathleen) Modified to edit text on 4/15/2020 (cbru, ).
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay and Compel Arbitration. Response filed by Music Academy Success, LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/22/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McDaniel, Kathleen) Modified to edit text on 4/15/2020 (cbru, ).
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Charles Martin.(Joyner, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/11/2020. (cbru, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 4/14/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/12/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/9/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/9/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/9/2020, Discovery due by 9/8/2020, Motion in Limine due by 12/21/2020, Motions due by 9/22/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/7/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 1/11/2021, Mediation Due by 11/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/11/2020. (cbru, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than March 25, 2020. (cbru, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay and Compel Arbitration by David Charles Martin. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Joyner, Lindsay) Modified to edit text on 3/11/2020 (cbru, ).
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 6. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #7 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Music Academy Success, LLC. David Charles Martin served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Douglas) Modified to edit text on 2/20/2020 (cbru, ).
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (cbru, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David Charles Martin. (cbru, )
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Music Academy Success, LLC.(cbru, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/18/2020) (cbru, ).
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Charles Martin (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8950041) filed by Music Academy Success, LLC. Service due by 5/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MASS Terms and Conditions, #2 Exhibit B - License Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Legal Disclaimers, #4 Exhibit D - Conference Attendee Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - 7 Explosive Secrets)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Music Academy Success, LLC v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music Academy Success, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen McColl McDaniel
Represented By: Douglas W Kim
Represented By: Casey Merrell Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Charles Martin
Represented By: Laura Watkins Jordan
Represented By: Lindsay Anne Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?