United States of America v. 2019 Dodge Challenger Coupe
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2019 Dodge Challenger Coupe and Daquan Tyreek Funchess-Johnson
Claimant: Samuel L Funchess
Case Number: 3:2020cv01438
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #20 motion to strike #7 Claim (Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 6/5/2020 to create linkage (mmcd).
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #7 Claim by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 6/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Sherard, Carrie) (Main Document 20 replaced on 6/5/2020 with corrected document provided by filing user) (mmcd).
June 4, 2020 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #18 Order to Notify of Address Change placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Samuel L Funchess 13438 Honeytree Lane Pineville, NC 28134-9135. (mmcd)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing Claimant, Samuel L. Funchess, to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/4/2020. (mmcd)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Samuel L Funchess 13438 Honeytree Lane Pineville, NC 28134-9135 (asni, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate. Judge Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett added. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/26/2020. (asni, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Daquan Tyreek Funchess-Johnson.(Rutherford, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Mediation Order, #11 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Samuel L Funchess 13438 Honeytree Lane Pineville, NC 28134-9135 (asni, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 11/9/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/20/2020. (asni, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/9/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/23/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 6/23/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/2/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/2/2020, Discovery due by 11/2/2020, Motions due by 11/16/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/31/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 2/2/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/20/2020. (asni, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 05/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement)(Sherard, Carrie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Daquan Tyreek Funchess-Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Jury Demand, #2 Main Document Claim)(Rutherford, James)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 CLAIM for property by Samuel L Funchess. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(asni, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sherard, Carrie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Defendant. (Sherard, Carrie)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (asni, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (asni, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2019 Dodge Challenger Coupe, filed by United States of America. Service due by 7/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 verification)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2019 Dodge Challenger Coupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2019 Dodge Challenger Coupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daquan Tyreek Funchess-Johnson
Represented By: James Todd Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Samuel L Funchess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?