Heyward v. South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles
Plaintiff: Brady Heyward
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles
Case Number: 3:2020cv01703
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Richard J Morgan for August 24 - September 4, 2020 (Morgan, Richard)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Brady Heyward.(Bowen, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles.(Morgan, Richard)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Brady Heyward.(Bowen, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Brady Heyward.(Bowen, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brady Heyward.(Bowen, Elizabeth)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/29/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/28/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/28/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/28/2020, Discovery due by 11/30/2020, Motions due by 12/11/2020, ADR Statement due by 1/10/2021, Mediation Due by 2/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 5/1/2020. (lbak)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles.(Morgan, Richard)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles. (lbak)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Richalnd Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-01515. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9079536), filed by South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyward v. South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Heyward
Represented By: James Lewis Cromer
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Richard J Morgan
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?