Wright v. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tress Wright
Defendant: Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. and Chris Daughtry
Case Number: 3:2020cv02636
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:247
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Tress Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order, Jackson v. Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Opinion, Estate of Joseph Maglioli, et. al. v. Andover Subacute Rehabilitation Center I, et. al.)(Cavanaugh, James) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/2/2020) (cbru, ). Modified to add descriptions to attachments on 9/2/2020 (cbru, ).
August 26, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Reply due by 9/8/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/26/2020.(cbru, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 24 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 22. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #23 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. (cbru, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tress Wright. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cavanaugh, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McKissock, Timothy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/15/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/13/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/13/2021, Discovery due by 7/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 10/26/2021, Motions due by 7/27/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/12/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 11/17/2021, Mediation Due by 9/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/20/2020. (cbru, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.(Stuckey, Erin) Modified to edit text on 8/20/2020 (cbru, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(Stuckey, Erin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. to 16 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (McKissock, Timothy)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 8/11/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/4/2020. (cbru, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Response to Motion due by 8/24/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/3/2020.(cbru, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McKissock, Timothy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tress Wright.(Cavanaugh, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 14, 2020. (cbru, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tress Wright. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thickens, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgement)(McKissock, Timothy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/16/2020. (cbru, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/19/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/14/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/14/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/13/2020, Discovery due by 1/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 4/26/2021, Motions due by 1/27/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/12/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 5/17/2021, Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/16/2020. (cbru, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(McKissock, Timothy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chris Daughtry.(cbru, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.(cbru, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-02616 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9221729) filed by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc., Chris Daughtry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Richardson Stuckey
Represented By: Timothy Michael McKissock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Daughtry
Represented By: Erin Richardson Stuckey
Represented By: Timothy Michael McKissock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tress Wright
Represented By: Joseph Odell Thickens
Represented By: James Eric Cavanaugh
Represented By: William H Yarborough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?