Bedenbaugh v. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.
Plaintiff: Geraldine Deloris Bedenbaugh
Defendant: Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02654
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:247
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 22 Order to Richland County Clerk of Court; ***DOCUMENT MAILED 22 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to The Honorable Jeanette W. McBride, Clerk of Court, Richland County Court of Common Pleas, PO Box 2766, Columbia, SC 29202-2766 (cbru, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Stipulation and Request for Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/3/2020. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.(cbru, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION and Request for Remand to State Court by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.. (McKissock, Timothy)
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Response to Motion due by 9/4/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/27/2020.(cbru, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McKissock, Timothy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/19/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/17/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/17/2021, Discovery due by 7/19/2021, Motion in Limine due by 10/29/2021, Motions due by 8/2/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/18/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 11/22/2021, Mediation Due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/25/2020. (cbru, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 Joint Responses to Local Civil Rule 26.03 Interrogatories and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. (McKissock, Timothy) Modified to edit text on 8/25/2020 (cbru, ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(McKissock, Timothy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Geraldine Deloris Bedenbaugh.(Felder, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Geraldine Deloris Bedenbaugh. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1--Estate of Maglioli v. Andover Subacute Rehab. Ctr., #3 Exhibit 2--Khalek v. S. Denver Rehab., LLC)No proposed order.(Calloway, Jordan) Modified to correct motion relief on 8/14/2020 (cbru, ).
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Christopher Calloway on behalf of Geraldine Deloris Bedenbaugh (Calloway, Jordan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. to 9 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (McKissock, Timothy)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 18, 2020. (cbru, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 8/11/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/4/2020. (cbru, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgement)(McKissock, Timothy)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/21/2020. (cbru, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/24/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/19/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/17/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/17/2020, Discovery due by 1/19/2021, Motion in Limine due by 4/29/2021, Motions due by 2/1/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/16/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 5/20/2021, Mediation Due by 4/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/21/2020. (cbru, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(McKissock, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.(cbru, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-02459 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9224135) filed by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedenbaugh v. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Michael McKissock
Represented By: Erin Richardson Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Deloris Bedenbaugh
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Represented By: Richard Abner Jones, III
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?