Ford v. MSA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nicole L Ford
Defendant: Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr and MSA Inc doing business as MSA Delivery Service
Case Number: 3:2020cv02873
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.03 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Nicole L Ford.(Stanley, Mark)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/26/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/24/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/29/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/29/2021, Discovery due by 8/2/2021, Motions due by 8/16/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/27/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 12/1/2021, Mediation Due by 8/3/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/11/2020. (asni, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 Discovery Plan and Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr, MSA Inc.(Highfield, Duke)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr, MSA Inc.(Highfield, Duke)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nicole L Ford.(Stanley, Mark)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 2/4/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/10/2020. (asni, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/31/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/14/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 9/14/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/26/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/25/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/29/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/29/2020, Discovery due by 1/28/2021, Motions due by 2/11/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/30/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/10/2020. (asni, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr, MSA Inc. (asni, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr, MSA Inc. (asni, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr, MSA Inc.(asni, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2020-CP-40-03074. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9263916), filed by MSA Inc, Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. MSA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Eugene Calvert, Jr
Represented By: Brandt Robert Horton
Represented By: Matthew Keith Harrison
Represented By: Duke Raleigh Highfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSA Inc doing business as MSA Delivery Service
Represented By: Brandt Robert Horton
Represented By: Matthew Keith Harrison
Represented By: Duke Raleigh Highfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole L Ford
Represented By: Mark Bradford Stanley
Represented By: Henry Ronald Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?