Gier v. Modern Exterminating Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Gier
Defendant: Modern Exterminating Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02991
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Modern Exterminating Company, Inc..(Savitz, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Modern Exterminating Company, Inc..(Savitz, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Modern Exterminating Company, Inc..(Savitz, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Steven Gier.(Dickey, Joseph) Modified to edit text on 9/2/2020 (cbru, ).
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Steven Gier.(Dickey, Joseph) Modified to edit text on 8/25/2020 (cbru, ). (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/26/2020) (cbru, ).
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY by Modern Exterminating Company, Inc. to 5 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Savitz, Stephen)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/20/2020. (cbru, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/23/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/19/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/17/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/17/2020, Discovery due by 2/16/2021, Motion in Limine due by 5/28/2021, Motions due by 3/2/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/17/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/21/2021, Mediation Due by 5/3/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/20/2020. (cbru, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 8/26/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/19/2020. (cbru, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Modern Exterminating Company, Inc.(cbru, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Modern Exterminating Company, Inc.(cbru, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-03038 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9288664) filed by Modern Exterminating Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gier v. Modern Exterminating Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Exterminating Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Terry Savitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gier
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?