Jamieson v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jamieson
Defendant: Glen Oxendine, Sr., John Classer, Richland County, John Harris, Jr. and James Galluzo
Case Number: 3:2020cv03475
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jennifer Jamieson.(Sarvis, Bryn)
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by John Classer.(Close, Leland)
November 10, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Glen Oxendine, Sr, Richland County.(Garfield, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by James Galluzo, John Harris, Jr.(McWilliams, Phillips)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by James Galluzo, John Harris, Jr.(McWilliams, Phillips)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by James Galluzo, John Harris, Jr.(McWilliams, Phillips)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leland Grant Close, III on behalf of John Classer (Close, Leland)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 11/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/5/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/4/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/8/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/8/2021, Discovery due by 5/5/2021, Motions due by 5/20/2021, ADR Statement due by 6/19/2021, Mediation Due by 7/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/7/2020. (lbak)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Classer.(Hedgepath, James)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by John Classer.(Hedgepath, James)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Galluzo, John Harris, Jr.(McWilliams, Phillips)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by James Galluzo, John Harris, Jr.(McWilliams, Phillips)
October 4, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Glen Oxendine, Sr., Richland County.(Garfield, Robert) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/5/2020 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Glen Oxendine, Sr, Richland County. (lbak)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Richland Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-02187. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9377950), filed by Glen Oxendine, Sr, Richland County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit A - Consents to Removal) (lbak) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/2/2020 with corrected documents submitted by filing user.) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamieson v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Oxendine, Sr.
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Classer
Represented By: James T Hedgepath
Represented By: Leland Grant Close, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Carrington Mitchell
Represented By: Phillips Lancaster McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Galluzo
Represented By: Stephen Carrington Mitchell
Represented By: Phillips Lancaster McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jamieson
Represented By: Bryn Colette Sarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?