Johnson et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Harold Johnson, Theresa Rhoades and Dlorah Group, LLC
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03686
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 17 Order to Richland County Clerk of Court, ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to The Honorable Jeanette W. McBride, Clerk of Court, Richland County Court of Common Pleas, PO Box 2766, Columbia, SC 29202-2766 (cbru, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: After Defendant removed this action, Plaintiff filed a stipulation limiting its damage recovery to under the threshold for the amount in controversy requirement for diversity jurisdiction in this court. ECF Nos. #7 , #15 . Defendant thereafter noted it does not oppose remand if the court determines it no longer has jurisdiction. ECF No. #16 . Based on Plaintiff's stipulation, the amount in controversy for diversity jurisdiction is not met. Therefore, this case is remanded to the Richland County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/16/2020. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.(cbru, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by American Strategic Insurance Corp. Filing corrected for event type. (cbru, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION AMENDED STIPULATION AS TO DAMAGES by Dlorah Group, LLC, Harold Johnson, Theresa Rhoades. (Edwards, William)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Show Cause Response due by 11/13/2020) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/9/2020. (cbru, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Response to Motion due by 11/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnsen, Jennifer)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than November 20, 2020. (cbru, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(Johnsen, Jennifer)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a stipulation limiting damages to under $75,000, the threshold for diversity jurisdiction. ECF No. #7 . As this limitation would render this court without jurisdiction over the case, Defendants are hereby ordered to show cause why the court should not remand this case no later than November 6, 2020. (Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2020) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/28/2020. (cbru, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Johnsen, Jennifer)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Damages by Dlorah Group, LLC, Harold Johnson, Theresa Rhoades. (Edwards, William)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Strategic Insurance Corp.(Johnsen, Jennifer) Modified to edit text on 10/23/2020 (cbru, ).
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #3 is incomplete. This party is directed to file a complete response to all subparts of the inquiry within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 10/27/2020) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/22/2020. (cbru, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Strategic Insurance Corp.(cbru, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-04381 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9421912) filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Johnson
Represented By: William H Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Rhoades
Represented By: William H Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dlorah Group, LLC
Represented By: William H Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer E Johnsen
Represented By: Natalie Rae Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?