Bedenbaugh v. Foo Fighters et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Bedenbaugh
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Inc, Roswell Records Inc, Foo Fighters, Capital One Financial Corp, RCA Records, John Doe 3, John Doe 2, Sony Music Entertainment, Struts, The, Liberty Media Corporation, John Doe 4, John Doe 1, Foo Fighters LLC and Live Nation Worldwide Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Capital One Services LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: MAC Presents, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00043
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Live Nation Worldwide Inc.(Dawson, Katon)
March 5, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Live Nation Worldwide Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Dawson, Katon)
March 2, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Dennis Bedenbaugh.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/9/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Barton, Frank)
March 2, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew L. Richardson, Jr re #25 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim by Capital One Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit return receipt card)(Richardson, Andrew)
February 17, 2021 Filing 25 Capital One Services, LLC ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MAC Presents, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against Foo Fighters LLC by Capital One Services LLC.(Richardson, Andrew)
February 16, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Foo Fighters LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Dawson, Katon)
February 11, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dennis Bedenbaugh (Barton, Frank)
February 10, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dennis Bedenbaugh (Barton, Frank)
February 10, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Live Nation Worldwide Inc. (kbos)
February 9, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Capital One Services LLC, John Doe 1, Foo Fighters LLC, Live Nation Worldwide Inc. (kbos)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Substitute Attorney Katon Dawson for Janet Holmes. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on February 5, 2021.(kbos)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Foo Fighters LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dawson, Katon)
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis Bedenbaugh. Service due by 5/3/2021 (Barton, Frank)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Dennis Bedenbaugh. (Barton, Frank)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Capital One Financial Corp.(Richardson, Andrew)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER or Respond until 2/3/2021 by Foo Fighters. (Holmes, Janet)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION by Plaintiff to Dismissal of Defendant Roswell Records, Inc by Foo Fighters. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney Jill Berliner)(Holmes, Janet)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Capital One Financial Corp answer due 2/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit correspondence with Plaintiff's counsel)(Richardson, Andrew)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Liberty Media Corporation answer due 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Correspondence from Plaintiff's Counsel)(Dawson, Katon)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Live Nation Entertainment Inc answer due 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Correspondence from Plaintiff's Counsel)(Dawson, Katon)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Luther Richardson, Jr on behalf of Capital One Financial Corp (Richardson, Andrew)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Foo Fighters.(kbos)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas Richland County, case number 2020-CP-40-4880. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9571296), filed by Foo Fighters. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kbos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedenbaugh v. Foo Fighters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Katon Edwards Dawson, Jr
Represented By: Jason Robert Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roswell Records Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foo Fighters
Represented By: Janet Brooks Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corp
Represented By: Andrew Luther Richardson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCA Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Struts, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Media Corporation
Represented By: Katon Edwards Dawson, Jr
Represented By: Jason Robert Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foo Fighters LLC
Represented By: Katon Edwards Dawson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Worldwide Inc
Represented By: Katon Edwards Dawson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Bedenbaugh
Represented By: Frank Anthony Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Capital One Services LLC
Represented By: Creighton McCall Segars
Represented By: Andrew Luther Richardson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MAC Presents, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?