Chestnut et al v. Renaud
Plaintiff: Tysheka Makayla Chestnut and Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 3:2021cv00497
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tysheka Makayla Chestnut, Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh re #7 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt)(Banias, Bradley)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tysheka Makayla Chestnut, Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh, filed by Tysheka Makayla Chestnut, Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh. Service due by 6/16/2021 (Banias, Bradley)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Murcier Bowens on behalf of Tracy Renaud (Bowens, Barbara)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Tysheka Makayla Chestnut, Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh. Tracy Renaud served on 2/22/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt)(Banias, Bradley)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tysheka Makayla Chestnut, Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh.(asni, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tracy Renaud. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (asni, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tracy Renaud ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9654219.), filed by Tysheka Makayla Chestnut, Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh. Service due by 5/18/2021(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestnut et al v. Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tysheka Makayla Chestnut
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohannad Abdelwadood Mesleh
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?