First Priority Medical Transport, LLC v. MCC Solutions, LLC et al
Counter Defendant: First Priority Medical Transport, LLC
Counter Claimant: MCC Solutions, LLC, Connectinc Global Management, LLC and Douglas Lambert
Case Number: 3:2021cv02801
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Connectinc Global Management, LLC, Douglas Lambert, MCC Solutions, LLC.(Poliakoff, Gary) Modified to edit text on 10/27/2021 (cbru, ).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by First Priority Medical Transport, LLC.(Detwiler, Richard)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Report by First Priority Medical Transport, LLC, Connectinc Global Management, LLC, Douglas Lambert, MCC Solutions, LLC.(Detwiler, Richard) Modified to add filers listed on document on 10/27/2021 (cbru, ).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by First Priority Medical Transport, LLC.(Detwiler, Richard)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #9 Counterclaim by First Priority Medical Transport, LLC.(Detwiler, Richard) Modified to edit text on 10/13/2021 (cbru, ).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Connectinc Global Management, LLC, Douglas Lambert, MCC Solutions, LLC.(Poliakoff, Gary) Modified to edit text on 10/7/2021 (cbru, ).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian T Duggan on behalf of First Priority Medical Transport, LLC (Duggan, Ian)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/23/2021. (cbru, )
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 10/27/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/22/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/21/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/20/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/20/2022, Discovery due by 3/21/2022, Motion in Limine due by 7/1/2022, Motions due by 4/5/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/20/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 7/22/2022, Mediation Due by 6/6/2022. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/23/2021. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 9/23/2021 (cbru, ).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than October 7, 2021.(cbru, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against First Priority Medical Transport, LLC by Connectinc Global Management, LLC, MCC Solutions, LLC, Douglas Lambert. (Attachments: #1 Termination Notice)(Poliakoff, Gary) Modified to edit text on 9/23/2021 (cbru, ).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W Poliakoff on behalf of Connectinc Global Management, LLC, Douglas Lambert, MCC Solutions, LLC (Poliakoff, Gary)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Priority Medical Transport, LLC. MCC Solutions, LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Detwiler, Richard) Modified to edit text on 9/9/2021 (cbru, ). (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/9/2021) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2021: #1 Affidavit of Service) (cbru, ).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Douglas Lambert. (cbru, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Connectinc Global Management, LLC. (cbru, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MCC Solutions, LLC. (cbru, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by First Priority Medical Transport, LLC.(cbru, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connectinc Global Management, LLC, Douglas Lambert, MCC Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10045575) filed by First Priority Medical Transport, LLC. Service due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sub-contract)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Priority Medical Transport, LLC v. MCC Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: First Priority Medical Transport, LLC
Represented By: Richard Carl Detwiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MCC Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Gary W Poliakoff
Represented By: Raymond P Mullman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Connectinc Global Management, LLC
Represented By: Gary W Poliakoff
Represented By: Raymond P Mullman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Douglas Lambert
Represented By: Gary W Poliakoff
Represented By: Raymond P Mullman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?