Mullins et al v. Dominion Energy South Carolina Inc
Plaintiff: Robbie Darryl Mullins and Tammy Mullins
Defendant: Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv03165
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #21 Order on Motion to Remand,, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jeanette W. McBride, Richland County Clerk of Court, PO Box 2766, Columbia, SC 29202-2766. (ahil)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #21 Order on Motion to Remand, to Jeanette W. McBride, Clerk of Court for Richland County at mcbridej@recgov.us and Virginia Belcher with the Richland County Clerk's Office at belcher.virginia@richandcountysc.gov (ahil)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand. This court is one of limited jurisdiction, and this case is one that does not fall within the parameters of that limited jurisdiction. In accordance with the foregoing, Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, ECF No. 7, is GRANTED. The matter is REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas for Richland County, South Carolina. The attorneys in this case are responsible for supplementing the state court record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on April 12, 2022.(ahil) Modified on 5/12/2022 eo edit text (ahil).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Sherri A Lydon: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2022; taking under advisement #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Tammy Mullins, Robbie Darryl Mullins ; court to file written order. Court Reporter Carly Horenkamp. (mflo, )
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Remand: Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2022 10:00 AM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Sherri A Lydon. (ahil)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Kyle R. Jackson, Sr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Robbie Darryl Mullins and Tammy Mullins. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on December 1, 2021.(ahil)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Jeff P. Shover to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Robbie Darryl Mullins and Tammy Mullins. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on November 30, 2021.(ahil)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Kyle G. A. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Robbie Darryl Mullins and Tammy Mullins. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on November 30, 2021.(ahil)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle G.A. Wallace ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10202893) by Robbie Darryl Mullins. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Reynolds, Phillip)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeff P. Shiver ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10202831) by Robbie Darryl Mullins. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Reynolds, Phillip)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle R. Jackson, Sr. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10202692) by Robbie Darryl Mullins. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Reynolds, Phillip)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Plaintiffs' Response filed by Robbie Darryl Mullins. (Reynolds, Phillip)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/19/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1995 Shoreline Management Plan - Current)(Pugh, Steven)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion to Stay Scheduling Order. The remaining deadlines in the scheduling order, ECF No. #6 , are stayed pending the court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand at ECF no. #7 . Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on November 10, 2021.(ahil)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay re #6 Scheduling Order by Robbie Darryl Mullins. Response to Motion due by 11/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Reynolds, Phillip)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Robbie Darryl Mullins, Tammy Mullins. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Dominion Energy Lake Murray Permitting Guidelines Residential Policies and Procedures)No proposed order.(ahil)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONFERENCE and SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/26/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 11/9/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/20/2021, Plaintiffs' ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2022, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/14/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/7/2022, Discovery due by 4/4/2022, Motion in Limine due by 6/3/2022, Motions due by 4/18/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/13/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 7/5/2022, Mediation Due by 5/2/2022, Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on October 6, 2021. (ahil)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc..(Pugh, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc.(ahil)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc. (ahil)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-40-04372. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10101097), filed by Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1927 License, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1984 License, #4 Exhibit 4 - SCDNR Accident Report)(ahil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullins et al v. Dominion Energy South Carolina Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Darryl Mullins
Represented By: Phillip Jason Reynolds
Represented By: Jeff P Shiver
Represented By: Kyle R Jackson, Sr
Represented By: Kyle GA Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Mullins
Represented By: Phillip Jason Reynolds
Represented By: Jeff P Shiver
Represented By: Kyle R Jackson, Sr
Represented By: Kyle GA Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Chandra Austin Stallworth
Represented By: Megan Christine White
Represented By: Robert Wilder Harte
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?