South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The et al v. McMaster et al
Plaintiff: South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The and Taiwan Scott
Defendant: Henry D McMaster, Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin, James H Lucas, Chris Murphy, Wallace H Jordan, Howard Knabb, John Wells, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley and Howard Knapp
Case Number: 3:2021cv03302
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Wells Nicholson on behalf of Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Nicholson, Thomas)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Wells Nicholson on behalf of JoAnne Day (Nicholson, Thomas)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting [ECF No. 17] Plaintiffs' Motion Requesting a Three-Judge Panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2248(a). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/9/2021.(aabd, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER: The court previously stayed the proceedings in this case until January 18, 2021, to give the South Carolina Legislature time to draw up districting plans ahead of upcoming election deadlines. (ECF No. 63.) At this time, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 59) and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 61) remains pending before the court. In order to facilitate the timely and judicious resolution of these issues once the stay is lifted, the court now orders the parties to file any responses in opposition to the pending motions by Friday, December 17, 2021. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/6/2021. (asni, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.(Burchstead, Michael)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.(Burchstead, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane W Trinkley on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Trinkley, Jane)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Crum on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Crum, Mary)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Reid Burchstead on behalf of JoAnne Day, Clifford J Elder, Howard Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Burchstead, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND OPINION granting in part #51 Motion to Stay by House Defendants'; denying #57 Motion to Dismiss by Senate Defendants'; and Staying the case until January 18, 2022. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/12/2021.(asni, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Henry D McMaster.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/16/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Limehouse, Thomas)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response to Motion due by 11/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Henry D McMaster. No proposed order.(Limehouse, Thomas)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/16/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bryant, Christopher)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Taiwan Scott Declaration, #2 Exhibit South Carolina NAACP Declaration, #3 Exhibit Bryant Attorney Declaration)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/16/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Tyson, Robert)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay the Case by Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin. Response to Motion due by 11/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tyson, Robert). Added MOTION to Stay on 11/10/2021 (asni, ).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER James H Lucas answer due 11/30/2021; Chris Murphy answer due 11/30/2021; Wallace H Jordan answer due 11/30/2021. (Mathias, Andrew)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/5/2021.(asni, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION Request for a three-judge panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(a) Combined Reply to Governor's and Senate Defendants' responses Response filed by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. (Bryant, Christopher)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is House Defendants' Motion to Stay the present litigation. (ECF No. 51.) House Defendants allege Plaintiffs' constitutional challenge to South Carolina's current legislative districts is not yet ripe for judicial review. Local Civ. Rule 7.06 (D.S.C.) ordinarily permits opposing parties fourteen (14) days to file a memorandum or response to a motion. This case implicates time-sensitive and weighty issues of federal constitutional law. In the interest of achieving a timely resolution of this matter, the court ORDERS the parties to file any memoranda or responses in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay (ECF No. 51) by November 9, 2021. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/4/2021. (asni, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Kenny ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10169893) by Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Application Affidavit for PHV Admission - Kenny, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Certificate of Good Standing - Kenny)No proposed order.(Tyson, Robert)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support by Wallace H Jordan, James H Lucas, Chris Murphy. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wilkins, William)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/2/2021.(asni, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Somil B. Trivedi ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10162489) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Trivedi Notarized Application and COGS)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The identifying Corporate Parent NAACP for South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The.. (Bryant, Christopher)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION Request for a three-judge panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(a) Response filed by Henry D McMaster.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/4/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Lambert, William)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin.(Tyson, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION Request for a three-judge panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(a) Response and Memo in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Three Judge Court Response filed by Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/4/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Tyson, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/26/2021.(asni, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/26/2021.(asni, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/26/2021.(asni, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/26/2021.(asni, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stuart Naifeh ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10146644) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Naifeh PHV Application and Affidavit, #2 Naifeh Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/26/2021.(asni, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/26/2021.(asni, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/26/2021.(asni, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond Audain ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10146571) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Audain PHV Application and Affidavit, #2 Audain Certificate of Good Service)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah Aden ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10146553) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Aden PHV Application and Affidavit, #2 Aden Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Cusick ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10146512) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Cusick PHV Application and Affidavit, #2 Cusick Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Gryll ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10145959) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Gryll PHV Application and Affidavit, #2 Gryll Additional Bars and Associated Counsel, #3 Gryll Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samantha Osaki ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10145821) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Samantha Osaki Application and Affidavit)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patricia Yan ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10145665) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Patricia Yan Application and Affidavit)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion to Correct Scrivener's Error. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/22/2021.(asni, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Correct Scrivener's Error by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 11/5/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint, #2 Exhibit Corrected Summons)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wallace H Jordan, James H Lucas, Chris Murphy.(Mathias, Andrew)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Harvey Peeler served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021; Luke A Rankin served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Signed Peeler and Rankin Acceptance of Service)(Bryant, Christopher)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Wallace H Jordan served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021; James H Lucas served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021; Chris Murphy served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Signed Lucas, Murphy, and Jordan Acceptance of Service)(Bryant, Christopher)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Henry D McMaster served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Signed McMaster Acceptance of Service, #2 Letter accompanying signed acceptance of service)(Bryant, Christopher)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION Request for a three-judge panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(a) Response filed by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Bryant, Christopher)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/21/2021.(asni, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John M. Gore ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10137675) by Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin. Response to Motion due by 11/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice - Gore, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tyson, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry D McMaster.(Limehouse, Thomas)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Ashley Limehouse, Jr on behalf of Henry D McMaster (Limehouse, Thomas)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Tyson, Jr on behalf of Harvey Peeler, Luke A Rankin (Tyson, Robert)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION Request for a three-judge panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(a) Response filed by Wallace H Jordan, James H Lucas, Chris Murphy.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/26/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murphy Letter dated 10/8/2021, #2 Exhibit Murphy Letter dated 9/3/2021, #3 Exhibit NAACP Email dated 10/8/2021)(Wilkins, William)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION Request for a three-judge panel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(a) by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Addison Mathias on behalf of Wallace H Jordan, James H Lucas, Chris Murphy (Mathias, Andrew)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Scott Moseley. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Linda McCall. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Clifford J Elder. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to JoAnne Day. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to John Wells. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Howard Knapp. (asni, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/22/2021) (asni, ). Modified to replace document to correct scrivener's error on 10/22/2021 (asni, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Wallace H Jordan. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Chris Murphy. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to James H Lucas. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Luke A Rankin. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Harvey Peeler. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Henry D McMaster. (asni, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The.(asni, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/13/2021) (asni, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10118586.), filed by Taiwan Scott, South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The. Service due by 1/10/2022(asni, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/22/2021) (asni, ). Modified to replace document to correct scrivener's error on 10/22/2021 (asni, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The et al v. McMaster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, The
Represented By: Christopher James Bryant
Represented By: David Allen Chaney, Jr
Represented By: John Cusick
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Raymond Audain
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Gryll
Represented By: Somil B Trivedi
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taiwan Scott
Represented By: Christopher James Bryant
Represented By: David Allen Chaney, Jr
Represented By: John Cusick
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: Patricia Yan
Represented By: Raymond Audain
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Gryll
Represented By: Somil B Trivedi
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry D McMaster
Represented By: Christopher Ernest Mills
Represented By: Michael Gregory Shedd
Represented By: Thomas Ashley Limehouse, Jr
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Peeler
Represented By: La'Jessica Stringfellow
Represented By: Robert E Tyson, Jr
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Represented By: John M Gore
Represented By: Stephen J Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke A Rankin
Represented By: La'Jessica Stringfellow
Represented By: Robert E Tyson, Jr
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Represented By: John M Gore
Represented By: Stephen J Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H Lucas
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Represented By: Hamilton Bohanon Barber
Represented By: Jennifer Joan Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Murphy
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Represented By: Hamilton Bohanon Barber
Represented By: Jennifer Joan Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace H Jordan
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Represented By: Hamilton Bohanon Barber
Represented By: Jennifer Joan Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Knabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wells
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Thomas Wells Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnne Day
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Thomas Wells Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J Elder
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Thomas Wells Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda McCall
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Thomas Wells Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moseley
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Thomas Wells Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Knapp
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Thomas Wells Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?