Parker v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Denise Parker
Defendant: Ward Douglas Ward, Michael Timothy McTigue, Stephen Kent Aiton, Troy Anthony Clay, Rodney D. Fogg, Milford Howard Beagle, Jr. and Marcus Aaron Motley
Case Number: 3:2021cv03708
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Michelle Denise Parker. (lbak)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Order Service - Non-Inmate and #7 Summonses Issued as to USA, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Michelle Denise Parker, PO Box 291102, Columbia, SC 29229. (lbak)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Stephen Kent Aiton, Milford Howard Beagle, Jr, Troy Anthony Clay, Rodney D. Fogg, Michael Timothy McTigue, Marcus Aaron Motley, Ward Douglas Ward. Debra S. Tedeschi for the Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 2/15/2022. (lbak)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk to Plaintiff and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 11/17/2021. (lbak)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michelle Denise Parker. (bgoo)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michelle Denise Parker. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number SCX300096284.) (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Denise Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Douglas Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Timothy McTigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Kent Aiton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Anthony Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney D. Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford Howard Beagle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Aaron Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?