Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Nephron SC, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Nephron SC, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00137
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/8/2022. (cbru, )
March 8, 2022 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 4/11/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/6/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/6/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/5/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/5/2022, Discovery due by 9/6/2022, Motion in Limine due by 12/19/2022, Motions due by 9/19/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/2/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 1/9/2023, Mediation Due by 11/17/2022. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/8/2022. (cbru, )
March 7, 2022 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nephron SC, Inc..(Ricard, Rhett)
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nephron SC, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 3/21/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Patent Exhibit)No proposed order.(Ricard, Rhett) Modified to edit text on 3/7/2022 (cbru, ).
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhett Douglas Ricard on behalf of Nephron SC, Inc. (Ricard, Rhett) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/8/2022) (cbru, ).
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Lee Hudson on behalf of Nephron SC, Inc. (Hudson, Seth)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Nephron SC, Inc. served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Dharamsi, Tasneem)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nephron SC, Inc. (cbru, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (cbru, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(cbru, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nephron SC, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10282422) filed by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Service due by 4/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 11,090,278)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Nephron SC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Allen Hinson
Represented By: Tasneem Dharamsi
Represented By: Timothy David St Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nephron SC, Inc.
Represented By: Rhett Douglas Ricard
Represented By: Seth Lee Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?