Hawkins v. Bayview Loan Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Mack Hawkins
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing and Citifinancial Servicing
Case Number: 3:2022cv01750
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 7 REPLY by Johnny Mack Hawkins to #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (lbak)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, #5 Order and one Summons placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Johnny Mack Hawkins, 118 Cardamon Court, Columbia, SC 29203. (lbak) Modified on 6/10/2022 to edit docket text. (lbak)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiff to answer the attached special interrogatories within 21 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's answers should be filed with this court. (Specific Document due by 6/29/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/8/2022. (lbak)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 6/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/8/2022. (lbak)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number SCX300099343.), filed by Johnny Mack Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Notary Jurat)(dist)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Bayview Loan Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Mack Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citifinancial Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?