Plant et al v. Avon Products Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sarah J Plant and Parker Plant
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties LLC, Vanderbuilt Minerals LLC, Vi-Jon LLC, Avon Products Inc, Amaco LLC, American Art Clay Co Inc, Bargain Barn, The LLC, Beacon CMP Corporation, Belk Inc, Block Drug Company Inc, Brenntag North America Inc, Brenntag Specialties Inc, Mineraland Pigment Solutions Inc, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Chattem Inc, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Color Techniques Inc, Conopco Inc, Dana Classic Fragrances Inc, Dillard's Inc, Dollar General Corporation, Elizabeth Arden Inc, Estee Lauder Inc, Estee Lauder International Inc, Estee Lauder Companies Inc, The, Hamrick's Incorporated, Highwater Clays Inc, Houbigant Inc, IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC, Ingles Markets Incorporated, L'Oreal USA Inc individually Successor in Interest Charles of the Ritz Inc Successor in Interest Jean Nate doing business as Lancome doing business as Maybelline Successor in Interest Yves Saint Laurent America Inc, L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. individually Successor in Interest Charles of the Ritz Inc Successor in Interest Jean Nate doing business as Lancome doing business as Maybelline Successor in Interest Yves Saint Laurent America Inc, Lowcountry Grocers LLC doing business as Piggly Wiggly, Martin Himmel Inc, Mary Kay Inc, Maybelline LLC, Noxell Corporation, Pfizer Inc, R T Vanderbilt Holding Company, Revlon Consumer Products Corporation, Revlon Inc, Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc, Southeastern Grocers Inc, Topco Associates LLC, R T Vanderbuilt Company Inc, Varity Wholesalers Inc doing business as Roses, Vi-Jon Inc, Walgreen Co, Walmart Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc, Winn-Dixie Stores Inc and Yves Saint Laurent America Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv00691
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motions held on February 22, 2023, at 4:30 p.m., before Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Court Reporter: Carly Horenkamp, RDR, CRR, CRC. E-mail: carleen_horenkamp@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 3/17/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2023. (chorenkamp)
February 23, 2023 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 19 Text Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Clerk of Court Richland County Court of Common Pleas PO Box 2766 Columbia, SC 29202-2766 (mflo, )
February 22, 2023 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 19 Text Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, to Clerk of Court for Richland County Court of Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 Text Order Certified) (mflo, )
February 22, 2023 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER Court grants after hearing oral arguments #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, Richland County Court of Common Pleas filed by Parker Plant, Sarah J Plant for reasons stated in open court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 2/22/23.(mflo, )
February 22, 2023 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2023 granting #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sarah J Plant, Parker Plant. Court Reporter Carly Horenkamp. (mflo, )
February 22, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Fabi USA Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Fabi LLC Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Fabi Diana Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Fabi 30b6 Deposition)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
February 22, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Mary Kay Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/1/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Extract from MIL Hearing 2.15.23, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Plant Consolidated MSJ Respnses, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Rite Aid of SC Depo Vol 1 (Lowell), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Rite Aid of SC Depo Vol. 2 (Penny), #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Rite Aid of SC Depo Vol. 3 (Reed), #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Rite Aid Motion for SJ, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - PLS MIL #9 Preclude Defendants, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 Amended S&C 04.11.2022)(Wilson, William)
February 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc (Cherry, Nicolas)
February 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Hall on behalf of IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC (Hall, Kevin)
February 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC (O'Neill, Mary)
February 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC (O'Neill, Mary)
February 22, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Todd Carroll on behalf of IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC (Carroll, Matthew)
February 22, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/1/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Rite Aid Memo in Support of MSJ)(Hall, Kevin)
February 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Wallace K Lightsey on behalf of Mary Kay Inc (Lightsey, Wallace)
February 22, 2023 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IMI FABI (Diana) LLC, IMI FABI (USA) Inc, IMI FABI LLC.(Hall, Kevin)
February 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2023 04:00 PM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, )
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . First attachment description: Filed State Court S&C CASE#2022CP4001265. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Exhibit Deposition of Susan Lowell, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Jonathan Penny, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Vani Reed, #5 Exhibit Rite Aid Answers to Pls' 1 set of Interrogs, #6 Exhibit Rite Aid Answers to Pls' Standard Interrogs and RTPs, #7 Exhibit Deposition of Sarah Plant, #8 Exhibit Pls' Response in Opp to Vi-Jon MSJ, #9 Exhibit 02-15-2023 MIL Hearing Transcript, #10 Exhibit Deposition of Patrice Johnson)(Kassel, John)
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Parker Plant, Sarah J Plant. Response to Motion due by 3/7/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Pls' Memo in Supp of Emergency Motion to Remand)No proposed order.(Kassel, John) see #6 additional attachment (Main Document 5 and Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2023 with filing attorney signature (mflo, ).
February 21, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Color Techniques Inc.(mflo, )
February 21, 2023 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mary Kay Inc.(mflo, )
February 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-40-1265. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10952664), filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Documents pretrial hearing transcript, #3 State Court Documents IMI FABI Documents)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plant et al v. Avon Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbuilt Minerals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vi-Jon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Art Clay Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bargain Barn, The LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon CMP Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belk Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Drug Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineraland Pigment Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Color Techniques Inc
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: William Henry Kleindienst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Classic Fragrances Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Arden Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estee Lauder Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estee Lauder International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estee Lauder Companies Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamrick's Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highwater Clays Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houbigant Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMI FABI (Diana) LLC
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMI FABI (USA) Inc
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMI FABI LLC
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingles Markets Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc individually Successor in Interest Charles of the Ritz Inc Successor in Interest Jean Nate doing business as Lancome doing business as Maybelline Successor in Interest Yves Saint Laurent America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. individually Successor in Interest Charles of the Ritz Inc Successor in Interest Jean Nate doing business as Lancome doing business as Maybelline Successor in Interest Yves Saint Laurent America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowcountry Grocers LLC doing business as Piggly Wiggly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Himmel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kay Inc
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Rachael Lewis Anna
Represented By: William Marvin Wilson, III
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maybelline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noxell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R T Vanderbilt Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of South Carolina Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Grocers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topco Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R T Vanderbuilt Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varity Wholesalers Inc doing business as Roses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vi-Jon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn-Dixie Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Saint Laurent America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah J Plant
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: John Daniel Kassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Plant
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: John Daniel Kassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?