Rawleigh v. Carolina Restoration LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alissa Rawleigh
Defendant: Carolina Restoration LLC doing business as Rytech Restorations of the Midlands, Rytech Inc, Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc, Carpet One Inc and Carolina Mold Solutions LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00774
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #19 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Lisa M. Comer 205 East Main Street Suite 128 Lexington, SC 29072 (jpet, )
April 1, 2024 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #19 Order, to Lexington County Clerk of Court (Attachments: #1 NEF, #2 Certified Order) (jpet, )
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carpet One Inc, granting #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Alissa Rawleigh, denying #5 MOTION to Sever filed by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc, denying Plaintiff's request for fees, and remanding #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc to state court. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 4/1/2024. **Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.(jpet, )
March 22, 2024 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rytech Inc.(jpet, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 3/25/2024) (jpet, ).
March 22, 2024 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carolina Restoration LLC. (jpet, ) (Main Document 17 replaced on 3/25/2024) (jpet, ).
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Carolina Restoration LLC, Rytech Inc. (Jones, Brandon) Modified to remove attachments and file separately as #17 and #18 on 3/22/2024 (jpet, ).
March 1, 2024 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. Re-filed for event type. (jpet, )
March 1, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand AND Reply to Response to Motion #5 Motion to Sever. Response filed by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/8/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Templeton, Morgan) Modified to edit text on 3/4/2024 (jpet, ).
March 1, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/8/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Templeton, Morgan)
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Alissa Rawleigh.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/6/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Indiana Sec. of State RE: Liberty Insurance Corp., #2 Exhibit Massachusetts Sec. of State RE: Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., #3 Exhibit Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. RE: Public Member Information)(Brehmer, Andrew)
February 28, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand AND Response in Opposition re #5 Motion to Sever by Alissa Rawleigh. Response to Motion due by 3/13/2024. Reply to response to motion #5 due by 3/6/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Brehmer, Andrew) Modified to edit text and add linkage on 2/29/2024 (jpet, ).
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alissa Rawleigh.(Brehmer, Andrew)
February 19, 2024 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carpet One Inc.(Moore, Stephen)
February 19, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carpet One Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/4/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Moore, Stephen)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Sever by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (jpet, )
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy of Insurance)(jpet, )
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.(jpet, )
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP3200180. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11592520), filed by Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy of Insurance, #2 State Court Documents)(jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawleigh v. Carolina Restoration LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Rawleigh
Represented By: Andrew Carson Brehmer
Represented By: Karl Stephen Brehmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Restoration LLC doing business as Rytech Restorations of the Midlands
Represented By: Brandon Paul Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rytech Inc
Represented By: Brandon Paul Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc
Represented By: James Ceth Land
Represented By: Morgan S Templeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpet One Inc
Represented By: Stephen Jahue Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Mold Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?