Brown v. Columbia, City of et al
Plaintiff: Floyd E. Brown
Defendant: Columbia, City of, Columbia Police Department, City of, David Hatcher, Stacy Harris, Shawn McNichols and Theresa Wilson
Case Number: 3:2024cv00884
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 23 Transfer of Case Management, #22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Floyd E. Brown 1416 E. Muller Ave. Columbia, SC 29203. (apsn)
April 12, 2024 Filing 23 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street Columbia, SC 29201. (apsn)
April 12, 2024 Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #1 Complaint, filed by Floyd E. Brown be dismissed without prejudice and without the issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 4/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 04/12/2024. (apsn)
April 9, 2024 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT by Floyd E. Brown to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(apsn)
April 8, 2024 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT by Floyd E. Brown to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(apsn)
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Floyd E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(apsn)
March 12, 2024 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order, #11 Proper Form Order, 12 Clerk's Notice, one summons form, Local Civil Rule 26.01 form, six summons forms placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Floyd E. Brown 1416 E. Muller Ave. Columbia, SC 29203. (apsn)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT granting plaintiff twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is entered to file an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies identified in this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that corrects those deficiencies, this action will be recommended for summary dismissal (Amended Complaint due by 04/2/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 03/11/2024. (apsn)
March 12, 2024 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in #11 Proper Form Order.(apsn)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 4/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 03/11/2024. (apsn)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 7 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Floyd E. Brown, 1416 E. Muller Ave., Columbia, SC 29203. (lbak)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett. Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Floyd E. Brown. (lbak)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Floyd E. Brown. Response to Motion due by 3/6/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Columbia Police Department, City of, Columbia, City of, Stacy Harris, David Hatcher, Shawn McNichols, Theresa Wilson, filed by Floyd E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (lbak) Modified on 4/9/2024 to reference supplement added at #17 and #21 (apsn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Columbia, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Police Department, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn McNichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?