Mincy v. Richland County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Therin Tracell Mincy
Defendant: Richland County Detention Center, Renaldo Myers, M Freely, Sgt Shawl, R Water, Officer Lott and Assistant Director Kathryn Harrell
Case Number: 4:2012cv00741
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Reports 23 and 94 are adopted and incorporated herein by reference and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice and without service of process as to the following Defendants : Richland County Detention Center; Director Renaldo Myers; Lt. M. Freely; Sgt. Shawl; Sgt. R. Waters; and Assistant Director Kathryn Harrell. The court also GRANTS Defendant Lotts Motion for Summary Judgment 81 and this action is DISMISSED in its entirety. Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as MOOT 73 . Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery (ECF No. 99 ), Motion to Appoint Counsel (ECF No. 100 ), and Motion for Injunction to Supersede Change of Venue (ECF No. 101 ) are also DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 08/06/2013. (dsto)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 51 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 53 Motion to Compel; denying 30 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/27/2012.(dsto, )
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; the plaintiffs request for an Order compelling the defendants to allow him access to Westlaw is DENIED, as the plaintiff has not presented a sufficient legal basis for issuing such an order. Objections to the Report and Recommendation are now due on or before June 25, 2012. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 06/04/2012.(dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mincy v. Richland County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therin Tracell Mincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaldo Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Freely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Shawl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Director Kathryn Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?