Terry v. Byars

Petitioner: Gary DuBose Terry
Respondent: William R Byars, Jr and Wayne C McCabe
Case Number: 4:2012cv01798
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Sol Blatt
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER: The Thirty Day Extension Order (Dkt. No. 160 ) is VACATED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 06/10/2019. (dsto, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: The Court therefore ORDERS that the deadlines of 28 U.S.C. § 2266(b)are extended by one THIRTY (30) DAY period to July 16, 2019. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 05/24/2019. (dsto, )
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay. Counsel for Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief and motion to lift the stay within thirty (30) days after the decision of the Court of Common Pleas in Case No. 2012-CP-32-2718 becomes final. See Rhines, 544 U.S. at 278.17 Counsel for Respondent may file a response fourteen (14) days after the filing of Petitioners supplemental brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/10/2012.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary DuBose Terry
Represented By: Derek J Enderlin
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Franklin-Best
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William R Byars, Jr
Represented By: John W McIntosh
Represented By: William Edgar Salter, III
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wayne C McCabe
Represented By: John W McIntosh
Represented By: William Edgar Salter, III
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?