Ward v. Muniz et al
Plaintiff: Joe Ward
Defendant: Roshell Smith, Cathy Brown, Nurse Harris, Leopoldo Muniz and Aiken County Sheriffs Office
Case Number: 4:2012cv03303
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Aiken
Presiding Judge: Sol Blatt
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court hereby adopts the R&R 73 and incorporates it herein; the Court overrules the Plaintiff's objections 78 ; and the Court grants the Defendants' motion for summary judgment 42 . Signed by Honorable Sol Blatt, Jr on 03/26/2014. (dsto, )
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff is given until September 6, 2013, to file any further responses to Defendants motion for summary judgment 42 pursuant to the Roseboro Order 46 ofJune 11, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/27/2013.(dsto, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/18/2013. (dsto, )
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court hereby adopts the R&R 17 and, it is ORDERED that Defendant Aiken County Sheriff's Office is dismissed from the case without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Sol Blatt, Jr on 03/11/2013. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Muniz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roshell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leopoldo Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aiken County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?