Reeves v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Andy Reeves
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2012cv03524
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b: It is ordered that the plaintiff's attorney may collect a fee of $10,130.90 from past due benefits. Plaintiff's attorney must refund to the plaintiff the EAJA award of $5,347.01. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 6/12/2015.(gnan )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. The plaintiff is hereby awarded fees in the amount of $5,347.01, representing 16.5 hours of attorney work at the rate of $181.25 an hour ($2,990.63) and 26 hours of paralegal work at the rate of $90.63 an hour ($2,356.38). Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/4/2014.(gnan )
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation in full. The Commissioner's decision is hereby reversed and remanded to the Commissioner for further action as set out in this order and the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 2/21/2014. (prou, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Reeves
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?