Cox v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Chavis Laranzo Cox
Defendant: Bruce Oberman, Anthony J Padula and Anthony Davis
Case Number: 4:2013cv00125
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Mary G Lewis
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court adopts and incorporates the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 68 ) by reference into this order. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 51 ) is GRANTED, and this case dismissed. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 04/03/2014. (dsto, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER finding as moot 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/28/2014.(dsto, )
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay. For good cause shown, it is therefore ordered that this matter is stayed until September 4, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/11/2013.(dsto, )
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court hereby adopts the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation 12 and incorporates it herein. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants Oberman and Padula are dismissed from this case without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 05/16/2013. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chavis Laranzo Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Oberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J Padula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?