Morrow v. Carolina Urologic Research Center LLC et al

Defendant: Stacy Harrelson and Carolina Urologic Research Center LLC
Plaintiff: Tamuera Morrow
Case Number: 4:2013cv00695
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Mary G Lewis
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 53 Report and Recommendation, as modified; granting 25 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Title VII and § 1981 federal law claims. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 9/24/2014. (hcic, )
July 30, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 7/30/2014.(mcot, )
July 23, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/23/2013.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Carolina Urologic Research Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Harrelson
Represented By: Henrietta U Golding
Represented By: James Keith Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Urologic Research Center LLC
Represented By: Henrietta U Golding
Represented By: James Keith Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamuera Morrow
Represented By: Bonnie Travaglio Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?